MN HF4313 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coverage of over-the-counter contraceptive drugs, devices, and products by insurers and medical assistance required.
Title
Coverage of over-the-counter contraceptive drugs, devices, and products by insurers and medical assistance required.
Sponsors
Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] | Rep. Liz Lee [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4232 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection