MN HF429 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; a resolution applying to Congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore balance and integrity to our elections.
Title
Elections; a resolution applying to Congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore balance and integrity to our elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Stephenson and Hollins |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF390 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections