MN HF429 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health treatment for communities of color funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Mental health treatment for communities of color funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Mahoney |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF398 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy