MN HF422 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care in rural Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Child care in rural Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-03-14 | House | Division action, return to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Mahoney, Lueck, Theis |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF537 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Family Care and Aging