MN HF4203 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Informed choice and expedited service authorization for technology systems demonstration partnership for people receiving home and community-based services authorized.
Title
Informed choice and expedited service authorization for technology systems demonstration partnership for people receiving home and community-based services authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Backer |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4268 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Referred to Human Services