MN HF419 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Author added Fabian
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Author added Fabian
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; providing that any new federal law designed to ban or limit any personal firearm, magazine, accessory, or ammunition, or to require the registration of any firearm or firearm owner shall be unenforceable.
Title
Firearms; providing that any new federal law designed to ban or limit any personal firearm, magazine, accessory, or ammunition, or to require the registration of any firearm or firearm owner shall be unenforceable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Author added Fabian |
2013-02-25 | House | Author added Myhra |
2013-02-21 | House | Author added Franson |
2013-02-18 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Erickson, S. |
2013-02-13 | House | Authors added Swedzinski and Gruenhagen |
2013-02-11 | House | Authors added Nornes and Dean, M. |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |