MN HF4056 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seizure detection device public awareness campaign grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Seizure detection device public awareness campaign grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Elkins |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Pha