MN HF4044 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota agricultural water quality certification program credit established for certified acres, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota agricultural water quality certification program credit established for certified acres, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Kiel |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Olson, B. |
2024-02-26 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Agriculture Finance and Policy |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF4241 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Referred to Taxes