MN HF400 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State contracts; vendor discrimination against Israel prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State contracts; vendor discrimination against Israel prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 103 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 98 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04 Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/03/17
2017-05-03 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-03 Secretary of State, Filed
2017-05-03 Governor approval
2017-05-01 Presented to Governor
2017-04-27SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2017-04-27HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 103-28
2017-04-27HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2017-04-27HouseMotion prevailed
2017-04-27HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2017-04-24HouseHouse rule 1.15, request for concurrence
2017-04-24HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-04-24SenateThird reading Passed vote: 57-8
2017-04-24SenateSpecial Order
2017-03-06SenateSecond reading
2017-03-06SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2017-02-27SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Finance
2017-02-27SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2017-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-02-27SenateReceived from House
2017-02-23HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 98-28
2017-02-23HouseThird reading as amended
2017-02-23HouseAmended
2017-02-22HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 23, 2017
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading
2017-02-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2017-02-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
2017-01-26HouseAuthor added Uglem.
2017-01-26HouseAuthor stricken Carlson, L.
2017-01-23HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF247 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - HF substituted in committee HF400

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0400&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=4&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2017&id=59
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=3315
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2017&id=207

Bill Comments

feedback