MN HF4 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill.
Title
Omnibus tax bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Drew Christensen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 80 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 1 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 18 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 80 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 1 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 18 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 66 | |
2017-05-15 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-32 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-15 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 34-32 |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 76-57 |
2017-05-10 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate conferees Chamberlain, Dahms, Miller, Senjem, and Rest. |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | House | House conferees Davids, Drazkowski, McDonald, Hertaus, and Marquart. |
2017-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Dahms; Miller; Senjem; Rest |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House conferees Davids; Drazkowski; McDonald; Hertaus; Marquart |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 40-27 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2255 |
2017-03-31 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2255, now on General Orders |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 80-52 |
2017-03-30 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2017-03-30 | House | Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-01-19 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Torkelson, Loonan, Pierson, Kiel, Layman, and Lueck. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2255 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4