MN HF397 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division
Pending: House Preventive Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division
Pending: House Preventive Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; messages, information, and community engagement services provision to diverse communities and populations in Minnesota contract funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; messages, information, and community engagement services provision to diverse communities and populations in Minnesota contract funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1054 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy