MN HF390 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for obstructing trunk highway, airport, or transit traffic increased.
Title
Penalties for obstructing trunk highway, airport, or transit traffic increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] |
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 71 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 71 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Veto | |
2018-05-19 | Governor veto | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 40-27 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF676 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF676, now on General Orders |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-09 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 71-55 |
2018-05-08 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Authors added Lucero and Lohmer. |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Backer. |
2017-01-26 | House | Authors added O'Neill, Howe, Uglem, Grossell, and Heintzeman. |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF676 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF390