MN HF3851 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Indian Child Welfare Advisory Council extended.
Title
American Indian Child Welfare Advisory Council extended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3421 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections