MN HF3850 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Facility licensure requirements for practitioners who only provide eyelash extensions repealed.
Title
Facility licensure requirements for practitioners who only provide eyelash extensions repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Randy Jessup [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Franson. |
2018-03-19 | House | Authors added Moran and Jessup. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3663 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Author added Hawj