MN HF384 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School year-long student teaching programs made part of teacher preparation, and money appropriated.
Title
School year-long student teaching programs made part of teacher preparation, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Authors added Ward and Bly. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF959 (Similar To) 2015-03-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance