MN HF376 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Willow River, Pine City, Cromwell, and Aitkin; existing broadband network funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Willow River, Pine City, Cromwell, and Aitkin; existing broadband network funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF807 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Rarick