MN HF374 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful gambling; clarifying, conforming, and technical changes made; games, prizes, and other provisions regulating conduct of lawful gambling modified; director of State Lottery prohibited from offering casino-style games, and sale of tickets of the State Lottery through a website or self-service devices suspended.
Title
Lawful gambling; clarifying, conforming, and technical changes made; games, prizes, and other provisions regulating conduct of lawful gambling modified; director of State Lottery prohibited from offering casino-style games, and sale of tickets of the State Lottery through a website or self-service devices suspended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF229 |
2015-02-26 | House | Author added Poppe. |
2015-02-25 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Author added Newton. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF229 (Similar To) 2015-05-19 - Secretary of State, Filed