MN HF3721 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School-age care programs expanded, and school-age care levy modified.
Title
School-age care programs expanded, and school-age care levy modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3922 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Pha