MN HF371 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Author added Curran
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Author added Curran
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Victims of crime grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Victims of crime grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Hassan |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF919 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Author added Pha