MN HF3694 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Mediation Services provisions modified.
Title
Bureau of Mediation Services provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to re-refer Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2020-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3861 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections