MN HF3671 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Delinquent child, juvenile petty offender, and child in need of protection or services definitions modified.
Title
Delinquent child, juvenile petty offender, and child in need of protection or services definitions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3694 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Author added Oumou Verbeten