MN HF3621 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State policy established supporting carbon capture and sequestration technology development.
Title
State policy established supporting carbon capture and sequestration technology development.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Igo [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Garofalo, Koznick, Lueck, and Heintzeman |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3661 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Second reading