MN HF3605 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local community grants to increase child care providers authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Local community grants to increase child care providers authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-28 | House | Authors added Poppe and Layman. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Hamilton. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3316 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy