MN HF360 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis and Duluth; high-speed passenger rail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis and Duluth; high-speed passenger rail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-01-23 | House | Author added Koegel. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF200 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Author added Dziedzic