MN HF3596 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community education programming funding increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Community education programming funding increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3586 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Author added Wiger