MN HF3558 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; advanced grant payments encouraged to certain persons, emerging farmers working group established, maximum loan amount under the pilot agricultural microloan program doubled, Noxious Weed Advisory Committee membership modified, processing defined for purposes of hemp law, hemp rulemaking authority modified, and changes to seed law made.
Title
Agriculture; advanced grant payments encouraged to certain persons, emerging farmers working group established, maximum loan amount under the pilot agricultural microloan program doubled, Noxious Weed Advisory Committee membership modified, processing defined for purposes of hemp law, hemp rulemaking authority modified, and changes to seed law made.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4532 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance