MN HF3550 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Watersheds, soil and water conservation districts, and wetland management provisions modified; wetland banking program and conservation easement programs modified; riparian protection and water quality jurisdiction clarified; provisions extended to apportion drainage repair costs; beaver damage control grants eliminated; Board of Water and Soil Resources authority and duties modified; and rulemaking required.
Title
Watersheds, soil and water conservation districts, and wetland management provisions modified; wetland banking program and conservation easement programs modified; riparian protection and water quality jurisdiction clarified; provisions extended to apportion drainage repair costs; beaver damage control grants eliminated; Board of Water and Soil Resources authority and duties modified; and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3559 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Second reading