MN HF3550 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Online hospitality training program creation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Online hospitality training program creation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Carlson |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Franke |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3771 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy