MN HF3549 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Presidential primary established, provisions related to precinct caucuses modified, and technical and conforming changes made.
Title
Presidential primary established, provisions related to precinct caucuses modified, and technical and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2016-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2985 |
2016-05-13 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-13 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2016-05-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2016-05-13 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2016-05-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2016-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2016-05-05 | House | Author added Hortman. |
2016-04-18 | House | Author added Schoen. |
2016-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2985 (Similar To) 2016-05-22 - Governor approval