MN HF3543 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MNsure operations funding and authority to certify health carriers and health plans modified; submission of federal waivers and approvals required; and limitations on risk-bearing placed.
Title
MNsure operations funding and authority to certify health carriers and health plans modified; submission of federal waivers and approvals required; and limitations on risk-bearing placed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Haley. |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Gruenhagen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Anderson, S. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3392 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes