MN HF3536 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Feist and Moran
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Feist and Moran
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Development Center grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Neighborhood Development Center grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Feist and Moran |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Jordan |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Mariani and Gomez |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3097 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Author added Putnam