MN HF3504 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal gang investigative data retention extended.
Title
Criminal gang investigative data retention extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3191 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy