MN HF35 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Council on Disability authorized to accept and disburse grants and other aids, and money appropriated for grants to cities and counties to improve website accessibility.
Title
Council on Disability authorized to accept and disburse grants and other aids, and money appropriated for grants to cities and counties to improve website accessibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Masin |
2021-01-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF416 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections