MN HF349 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic cigarettes included in definition of smoking for purposes of the Minnesota Clean Indoor Air Act, and technical and clarifying changes made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic cigarettes included in definition of smoking for purposes of the Minnesota Clean Indoor Air Act, and technical and clarifying changes made.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-03-18SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-18SenateReceived from House
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Bernardy, Hornstein, and Christensen
2019-03-14HouseBill was passed
2019-03-14HouseThird reading
2019-03-13HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Hansen
2019-02-28HouseSecond reading
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Davids
2019-02-14HouseAuthors added Olson and Mann
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Elkins and Zerwas
2019-02-04HouseAuthors added Long and Wagenius.
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Freiberg, Loeffler, and Layman.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF462 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback