MN HF3474 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reinvest in Minnesota (RIM) reserve program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Reinvest in Minnesota (RIM) reserve program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Legacy Finance |
2024-02-29 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4706 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Referred to Capital Investment