MN HF3423 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legacy fund money appropriated, and legacy fund requirements modified.
Title
Legacy fund money appropriated, and legacy fund requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State Chapter 208 | |
2018-05-29 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-29 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 95-32 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2018-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-05-20 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3167 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3167, now on General Orders |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-14 | House | Bill was passed vote: 124-0 |
2018-05-14 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3167 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3423