MN HF3422 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Wild rice water quality standards modified, wild rice work group established, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild rice water quality standards modified, wild rice work group established, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 86 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Governor veto
2018-05-21 Presented to Governor
2018-05-20SenateThird reading vote: 39-28
2018-05-20SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2018-05-20SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2018-05-20SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2018-05-20HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2018-05-20HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 86-42
2018-05-20HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2018-05-20HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2018-05-20HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2018-05-18HouseSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Eichorn, Utke, Tomassoni, Bakk
2018-05-18HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2018-05-18HouseHouse conferees Fabian, Lueck, Layman, Metsa, and Ecklund.
2018-05-18HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2018-05-18HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2018-05-18SenateSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Eichorn; Utke; Tomassoni; Bakk
2018-05-18SenateSenate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
2018-05-18SenateHouse conferees Fabian; Lueck; Layman; Metsa; Ecklund
2018-05-18SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2018-05-16SenateThird reading Passed vote: 67-0
2018-05-16SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2018-05-15SenateSecond reading
2018-05-15SenateComm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3170
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3170, now on General Orders
2018-05-14SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-05-14SenateReceived from House
2018-05-14HouseBill was passed vote: 124-0
2018-05-14HouseThird reading
2018-05-10HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018
2018-03-19HouseSecond reading
2018-03-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-03-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF3170 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3422

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF3422&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3422&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3422&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3422&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF3422&session_number=0&year=2017&id=557
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=9257
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF3422&session_number=0&year=2017&id=622
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=10429

Bill Comments

feedback