MN HF342 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Authors added Hamilton and Noor
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Authors added Hamilton and Noor
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota African American Family Preservation and Child Welfare Disproportionality Act established, African American and Disproportionality Child Welfare Oversight Council created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota African American Family Preservation and Child Welfare Disproportionality Act established, African American and Disproportionality Child Welfare Oversight Council created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Authors added Hamilton and Noor |
2019-03-28 | House | Authors added Cantrell and Halverson |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Dehn. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF730 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy