MN HF3414 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local lodging tax provisions modified, and authority clarified for political subdivisions to impose and collect local lodging taxes.
Title
Local lodging tax provisions modified, and authority clarified for political subdivisions to impose and collect local lodging taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Coulter [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] |
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Baker |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Elkins |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3976 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Taxes