MN HF340 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor heritage fund previous appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Outdoor heritage fund previous appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1019 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance