MN HF3398 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Carlson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Carlson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No-knock search warrants prohibited.
Title
No-knock search warrants prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Carlson |
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2022-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Mortensen |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Howard |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-21 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; Hausman and Jordan |
2022-02-17 | House | Authors added Frederick and Bernardy |
2022-02-15 | House | Authors added Mariani and Her |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |