MN HF336 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Metsa.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Metsa.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Silver Bay; Black Beach campground funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Silver Bay; Black Beach campground funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Metsa. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-03-30 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF243 (Similar To) 2017-01-19 - Referred to Capital Investment