MN HF334 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agency policy provisions adopted, occupational safety and health data classified, minor apprenticeship data classified, and Construction Codes Advisory Council membership modified.
Title
Agency policy provisions adopted, occupational safety and health data classified, minor apprenticeship data classified, and Construction Codes Advisory Council membership modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-13 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF226 |
2021-02-25 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Ecklund |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF226 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Second reading