MN HF3326 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Pfarr, Torkelson, Anderson, and Akland
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Pfarr, Torkelson, Anderson, and Akland
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aggravated sentence required for violent offenders, consecutive sentences required for violent offenders, and offenders required to serve entire announced sentence in custody.
Title
Aggravated sentence required for violent offenders, consecutive sentences required for violent offenders, and offenders required to serve entire announced sentence in custody.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Authors added Pfarr, Torkelson, Anderson, and Akland |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Lueck |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Haley |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3224 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy