MN HF3325 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Hassan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Hassan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Displaced homemaker program language modernized.
Title
Displaced homemaker program language modernized.
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Hassan |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Koznick, Gunther, and Baker |
2020-02-26 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3092 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Author added Dahms