MN HF331 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Registered predatory offender status disclosure required to hospice provider.
Title
Registered predatory offender status disclosure required to hospice provider.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-22 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF443 |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Frazier and Xiong, J. |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF443 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed