MN HF331 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco; charter schools added to prohibition of tobacco in schools, tobacco sale age increased, administrative penalties increased, municipal license of tobacco provision added, and alternative penalties allowed.
Title
Tobacco; charter schools added to prohibition of tobacco in schools, tobacco sale age increased, administrative penalties increased, municipal license of tobacco provision added, and alternative penalties allowed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 89 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 89 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 88 | |
2020-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-16 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-12 | House | Author added Hassan |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-09 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-05-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 9, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | Author added Halverson |
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-03-03 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Her, Elkins, and Noor |
2019-02-28 | House | Authors added Nornes, Long, and Hansen |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Olson, Mann, and Brand |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Wagenius. |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added Loeffler and Freiberg. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF463 (Similar To) 2020-05-13 - Chief author added Chamberlain