MN HF327 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Authors added Bennett and Flanagan.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Authors added Bennett and Flanagan.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational disease provisions modified.
Title
Occupational disease provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Authors added Bennett and Flanagan. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Olson. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF125 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Author added Bigham