MN HF3243 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pension rate base for purposes of rate increase hearings established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension rate base for purposes of rate increase hearings established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 16, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseSecond reading
2018-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2018-03-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2879 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback