MN HF3232 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Solar energy incentive program modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar energy incentive program modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 87 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Secretary of State Chapter 193
2018-05-29 Governor's action Approval
2018-05-29 Secretary of State, Filed
2018-05-29 Governor approval
2018-05-19 Presented to Governor
2018-05-18SenateThird reading vote: 61-0
2018-05-18SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2018-05-18SenateConference committee report
2018-05-18SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2018-05-18HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 61-0
2018-05-18HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 87-35
2018-05-18HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2018-05-18HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2018-05-18HouseConference committee report
2018-05-16SenateSenate conferees Osmek; Mathews; Marty
2018-05-16HouseSenate conferees Osmek, Mathews, Marty
2018-05-16HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2018-05-15HouseHouse conferees O'Neill; West; and Bahr, C.
2018-05-15HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2018-05-15HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2018-05-15SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2018-05-15SenateHouse conferees O'Neill; West; Bahr, C.
2018-05-15SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2018-05-10SenateThird reading Passed vote: 65-0
2018-05-10SenateTaken from table
2018-05-10SenateLaid on table
2018-05-10SenateSpecial Order
2018-05-07SenateSecond reading
2018-05-07SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2696
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2696, now on General Orders
2018-05-03SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-05-03SenateReceived from House
2018-05-02HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 79-44
2018-05-02HouseThird reading as amended
2018-05-02HouseAmended
2018-04-30HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 02, 2018
2018-03-28HouseSecond reading
2018-03-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-03-22HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-03-21HouseAuthor added Maye Quade.
2018-03-14HouseAuthor added Lillie.
2018-03-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2696 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3232

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF3232&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3232&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3232&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3232&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3232&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3232&version=4&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF3232&session_number=0&year=2017&id=473
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=8839
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=9310
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF3232&session_number=0&year=2017&id=608

Bill Comments

feedback